VA HB683 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Family life education programs; student participation. Prohibits any public elementary or secondary school student from participating in any family life education program without the prior written consent of his parent.
Title
Family life education programs; student participation.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Sen. John McGuire [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Education |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102612D |