VA HB68 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Communications, Technology and Innovation
Pending: House Communications, Technology and Innovation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Digital devices; deactivation or alteration of embedded software. Prohibits the original equipment manufacturer of a digital device from deactivating embedded software, defined in the bill, in the digital device or altering embedded software so as to substantially alter the functioning of the digital device as a response to its being repaired by an independent repair provider. The measure also provides that the original equipment manufacturer of a digital device shall not be liable to an owner of a digital device for any damages resulting from repair or modification to the digital device made at the request of the owner by an independent repair provider.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Digital devices; deactivation or alteration of embedded software.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Communications, Technology and Innovation
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned CT & I sub: Technology and Innovation
2019-12-05HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2019-12-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100828D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591571(n/a)See Bill Text
591574(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback