VA HB68 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Control of firearms; libraries owned or operated by localities. Allows a locality to adopt an ordinance that prohibits firearms, ammunition, or components or a combination thereof in libraries owned or operated by the locality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; libraries owned or operated by localities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Militia, Police and Public Safety
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N)
2018-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-12-04HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2017-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100831D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152915(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback