VA HB679 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Real and personal property tax exemptions. Repeals the property tax exemptions for all nonprofit entities that were granted by the General Assembly by designation, effective July 1, 2025. Any locality may grant property tax exemptions to any such organizations to become effective on or after that date.
Title
Real and personal property tax exemptions; repeals exemptions.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Finance |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102616D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3650.1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |