VA HB676 | 2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB676
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Criminal Justice Services; school resource officers; establishment of minimum employment qualifications prohibited. Prohibits the Department of Criminal Justice Services from establishing minimum qualifications for the employment of school resource officers, including any minimum age or experience requirement, or providing guidance or standards or adopting regulations relating to such minimum qualifications unless expressly authorized by law.
Title
School resource officers; establishment of minimum employment qualifications prohibited.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | House | Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101906D |
Same As/Similar To
HB676 (Carry Over) 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote