VA HB673 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB673

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Cruelty to children; penalty. Increases the penalty from a Class 6 felony to a Class 4 felony for any person employing or having custody of a child to willfully cause or permit such child to be tortured physically or psychologically, tormented, mutilated, beaten, or cruelly treated. The bill includes such offense in the definition of "violent felony" for purposes of determining felony sentencing guidelines. The bill also includes willful and negligent acts of cruelty and injuries to children in offenses prohibiting a person from operating or residing in a family day home and provides that a conviction is a barrier crime for persons providing care to certain children or the elderly or disabled.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cruelty to children; increases penalty to a Class 4 felony.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateContinued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 20108644D-S1
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB673H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107948D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107948D-H1
2020-02-07HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
2020-02-04HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101936D

Same As/Similar To

HB673 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171805(n/a)See Bill Text
182371.1:1(n/a)See Bill Text
192268.3(n/a)See Bill Text
192386.35(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.02(n/a)See Bill Text
401103(n/a)See Bill Text
401113(n/a)See Bill Text
40179.01(n/a)See Bill Text
40179.1(n/a)See Bill Text
6321530(n/a)See Bill Text
6321727(n/a)See Bill Text
801226.5:2(n/a)See Bill Text
91902(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB673
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB673+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB673H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB673S1+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB673F160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB673FH1160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB673FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0801C0155+HB0673
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H08C0230+HB0673
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HC0860+HB0673
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03C0424+HB0673

Bill Comments

feedback