VA HB673 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - House: Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-04 - House: Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State Corporation Commission; members. Increases the number of members of the State Corporation Commission from three to five, effective February 1, 2011. The measure also requires that each Commissioner initially elected or appointed to the State Corporation Commission on and after January 1, 2011, shall have a principal place of residence that is in a region of the Commonwealth in which no other Commissioner had his primary place of residence at the time of that other Commissioner's initial election or appointment.
Title
State Corporation Commission; increases number of members.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-04 | House: Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100138D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB673 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB673+hil |