VA HB671 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permanent protective orders; Hope Card Program created. Requires the Office of the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia to develop and all district courts and circuit courts to implement the Hope Card Program (the Program) for the issuance of a Hope Card to any person who has been issued a permanent protective order by any district court or circuit court. The bill provides that a Hope Card issued pursuant to the Program shall be a durable, plastic, wallet-sized card containing, to the extent possible, essential information about the protective order, such as the identifying information and characteristics of the person subject to the protective order, the issuance and expiration date of the protective order, the terms of the protective order, and the names of any other persons protected by the protective order.
Title
Permanent protective orders; Hope Card Program created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 374 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB671ER) |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2022-02-08 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government and Capital Outlay |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100428D |