VA HB67 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Human Rights Act; pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions; causes of action. Provides that no employer may discharge any employee on the basis of pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions, including lactation. Currently, the protection against discrimination on the basis of pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions applies only to an employer employing more than five but fewer than 15 persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Human Rights Act; pregnancy, childbirth, or related medical conditions, causes of action.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in General Laws
2018-02-08HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-12-04HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100819D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223903(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback