VA HB669 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0438)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0438)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property conveyance; Department of Conservation and Recreation; Natural Tunnel State Park. Authorizes the Department of Conservation and Recreation to accept, without consideration, certain real property in Scott County measuring approximately 1.85 acres in total.
Title
Natural Tunnel Parkway; authorizes DCR to accept certain real property in Scott County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0438) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 438 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB669ER) |
2018-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18102256D-E |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB669E |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102256D |