VA HB666 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0922)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0922)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vital records; definitions. Expands the definition of "dead body," for the purposes of the administration of vital records and the prohibition against disposal or concealment, to include human bodies or body parts beyond the recently deceased.
Title
Vital records; expands the definition of "dead body."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0922) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 922 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB666ER) |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage #2 (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 20100663D-E |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB666E |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100663D |