VA HB665 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Coal tax credits. Reinstates the Coalfield employment enhancement tax credit. The credit, which expired on July 1, 2016, can be earned on and after January 1, 2018, but before January 1, 2023, and only for metallurgical coal. This bill is identical to SB 378.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coalfield employment enhancement tax credit; metallurgical coal mined by underground methods.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (42-Y 55-N) (Y: 42 N: 55 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 36-N) (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 41-N) (Y: 59 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0853)
2018-05-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 853 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-04-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
2018-04-18HouseCommunicated to Governor
2018-04-18HouseVOTE: REJECTED (42-Y 55-N)
2018-04-18HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (42-Y 55-N)
2018-04-09HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2018-03-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
2018-03-05SenateSigned by President
2018-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB665ER)
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 36-N)
2018-02-28HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 18107741D-S1 (59-Y 36-N)
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-28SenatePassed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N)
2018-02-28SenateEngrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB665S1
2018-02-28SenateSubstitute by Senator Chafin agreed to 18107741D-S1
2018-02-28SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-28SenateFloor substitute printed 18107741D-S1 (Chafin)
2018-02-28SenateCommittee amendment rejected
2018-02-28SenateRead third time
2018-02-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-27SenateReported from Finance with amendment (10-Y 4-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (59-Y 41-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (59-Y 41-N)
2018-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 18104623D-E
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB665E
2018-02-12HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-09HouseRead first time
2018-02-07HouseReported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 8-N)
2018-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 2-N)
2018-01-25HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104623D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581433.1(n/a)See Bill Text
581439.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB665
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB665+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB665E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB665S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB665ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0853+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1003V0011+HB0665
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0031+HB0665
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H10V0078+HB0665
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0713+HB0665
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0307+HB0665
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0749HB0665+HB0665
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0758HB0665+HB0665
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1128+HB0665
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1643+HB0665

Bill Comments

feedback