VA HB661 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

First offense assault and battery against a family or household member; enhanced penalty. Provides that the deferral and dismissal of a first offense of assault and battery against a family or household member will be treated as a prior conviction for the purpose of determining whether a person is eligible for the enhanced Class 6 felony penalty for assault and battery against a family or household member, which applies on the basis of a person's prior convictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault and battery against a family or household member; enhanced penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseFailed to pass
2018-03-10HouseNo further action taken
2018-03-08SenateSenators: McDougle, Reeves, Peake
2018-03-08SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-08HouseDelegates: Murphy, Bell, Robert B., Habeeb
2018-03-08HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-08HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-08SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-08SenateSenate insisted on substitute (39-Y 1-N)
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
2018-03-07HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107909D-S1 (0-Y 97-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N)
2018-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB661S1
2018-03-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107909D-S1
2018-03-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107909D-S1
2018-03-01SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-21SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-21SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 1-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseReported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103526D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18257.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB661
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB661+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB661S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0801V0162+HB0661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H08V0116+HB0661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0666+HB0661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S03V0354+HB0661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0382+HB0661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0862HB0661+HB0661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0912HB0661+HB0661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1446+HB0661
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1062HB0661+HB0661

Bill Comments

feedback