VA HB660 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0989)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0989)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Deferred dispositions; property crimes; larceny and receiving stolen goods. Provides that a court, upon such plea if the facts found by the court would justify a finding of guilt, without entering a judgment of guilt and with the consent of the accused, may defer further proceedings and place him on probation subject to terms and conditions for a first offense misdemeanor larceny provided such person has not previously been convicted of any felony or had a prior deferred disposition for the same offense. The bill also provides that deferred disposition will no longer be allowed for peeping crimes. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference.
Title
Deferred dispositions; property crimes, larceny and receiving stolen goods, exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 3-N) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 43-N) (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 43-N) (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 3-N) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 43-N) (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0989) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 989 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB660ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 43-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (55-Y 43-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference substitute printed 20109830D-H2 |
2020-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senators: Deeds, Surovell, Stanley |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Delegates: Mullin, Delaney, Runion |
2020-03-02 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 96-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108749D-S1 (1-Y 96-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB660S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108749D-S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108749D-S1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (54-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (54-Y 43-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB660H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106737D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Incorporates HB1592 (Cole, M.L.) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106737D-H1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101944D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1592 (Similar To) 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
SB286 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0990)
SB286 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0990)