VA HB659 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Corrections; workgroup; recommendations to assist people with developmental disabilities. Directs the Department of Corrections to create a workgroup to review current guidelines and develop recommendations that recognize and make accommodations for people with developmental disabilities.
Title
People with developmental disabilities; DOC to create workgoup to review guidelines to assist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395) | |
2020-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 395 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB659ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB659H2 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 20107986D-H2 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee on Courts of Justice substitute rejected 20107219D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107986D-H2 |
2020-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107219D-H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103270D |