VA HB659 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0434)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

High school family life education curricula; programs on the prevention of dating violence, domestic abuse, sexual harassment, and sexual violence. Requires any high school family life education curriculum offered by a local school division to incorporate age-appropriate elements of effective and evidence-based programs on the prevention of dating violence, domestic abuse, sexual harassment, and sexual violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High school family life education curriculum; programs on prevention of dating violence, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0434)
2016-03-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0434)
2016-03-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 434 (effective 7/1/16)
2016-03-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
2016-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
2016-03-05SenateSigned by President
2016-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2016-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB659ER)
2016-03-02HouseEnrolled
2016-02-29SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
2016-02-29SenateRead third time
2016-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2016-02-25SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2016-02-18SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2016-02-16SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2016-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2016-02-15HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2016-02-15HouseRead third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
2016-02-12HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB659H1
2016-02-12HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 16104920D-H1
2016-02-12HouseRead second time
2016-02-11HouseRead first time
2016-02-10HouseCommittee substitute printed 16104920D-H1
2016-02-10HouseReported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2016-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
2016-01-15HouseAssigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education
2016-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2016-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101234D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221207(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB659
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB659+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB659H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB659ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+CHAP0435+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+CHAP0434+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H0901V0035+HB0659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+H09V0078+HB0659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+HV0522+HB0659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+S04V0189+HB0659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0676HB0659+HB0659
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+vot+SV0695HB0659+HB0659

Bill Comments

feedback