VA HB657 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Testimony using two-way closed-circuit television; certain offenses. Permits a victim of kidnapping, criminal sexual assault, or family offenses to testify via two-way closed-circuit television if the court finds that the victim is unable to testify in open court because he will suffer severe emotional trauma. Currently, only child victims who are under 16 years old at the time of trial and who were under 14 years old at the time of the offense and child witnesses who are under 14 years old at the time of trial may testify in this manner.
Title
Victims of crime; testimony using two-way closed-circuit television for certain offenses.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 4-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100841D |