VA HB653 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Read second time and engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Condemned growing beds; electronic maps. Authorizes the Commissioner of Marine Resources to provide public designation of condemned crustacea, finfish, or shellfish growing areas through the use of downloadable maps or digital interactive online maps. Current law requires that public notice be accomplished only with physical signs or markers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condemned growing beds; electronic maps.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-24HouseRead first time
2020-01-22HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102542D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
282807(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback