VA HB651 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB651
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-22 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-22 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; report on utilization of community intermediate care facilities for individuals with intellectual disabilities. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to report annually by December 1 of each year to the Governor and the Chairmen of the Senate Committees on Education and Health and Finance and Appropriations and the House Committees on Health, Welfare and Institutions and Appropriations regarding utilization of community intermediate care facilities for individuals with intellectual disabilities in the Commonwealth and to make such report available to the public on a website maintained by the Department.
Title
Individuals w/ intellectual disabilities; DMAS to report on use of community intermediate care.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-22 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-10 | House | Continued to 2023 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2023 by voice vote |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103956D |
Same As/Similar To
HB651 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Continued to 2023 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote