VA HB650 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; school consolidation and redistricting and pupil assignment; access to advanced academic programs. Requires a school board to demonstrate in advance that the consolidation of schools, redistricting of school boundaries, or adoption of a pupil assignment plan will maintain or increase equitable student access to advanced academic programs.
Title
School boards; school consolidation and redistricting and pupil assignment, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Education |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103271D |