VA HB65 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - House: Tabled in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - House: Tabled in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Print-on-demand ballots; restrictions on printing. Requires that any print-on-demand ballot system, used by a county or city for absentee or emergency voting, shall be used in accordance with the instructions of the State Board. Any person with the responsibility to print ballots must first sign a statement, subject to felony penalties, that he will: (i) print the number of ballots required for such absentee or emergency voting in accordance with the instructions of the electoral board; (ii) print, and permit to be printed, directly or indirectly, no more than that number; (iii) destroy at once any imperfect and perfect impressions other than those required for such absentee or emergency voting; (iv) distribute the type, if any, used for such work as soon as such number of ballots is printed; and (v) not communicate to anyone, in any manner, the size, style, or contents of such ballots.
Title
Print-on-demand ballots; restrictions on printing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | House: Tabled in Privileges and Elections by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-14 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #2 Elections | |
2009-12-28 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2009-12-28 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100723D |