VA HB647 | 2008 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Finance (HB139-Peace) by voice vote

Summary

Renewable and alternative energy production tax credit. Provides a tax credit for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2009, to the owners of a commercial facility in Virginia in the amount of $0.001 per kWh, or its equivalent, of renewable or alternative energy produced in a taxable year. This bill was incorporated into

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy production; renewable and alternative tax credit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2008-02-04 House: Incorporated by Finance (HB139-Peace) by voice vote
2008-01-15 House: Assigned Finance sub: 3
2008-01-08 House: Referred to Committee on Finance
2008-01-08 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080029536

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback