VA HB646 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0449)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0449)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pipeline construction permit; amount of civil penalty for violation. Authorizes the State Water Control Board to include civil penalties of up to $50,000 per violation, not to exceed $500,000 per order, in any order for a violation of a permit related to the construction of a natural gas transmission pipeline greater than 36 inches inside diameter. Current law limits such penalties to $32,500 per violation and $100,000 per order. The bill requires that at least two written notices of violation have been issued to the person constructing the pipeline, that such violations have not been resolved, and that a hearing has been conducted before the penalty can be assessed.
Title
Pipeline construction permit; amount of civil penalty for violation.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 39-N 1-A) (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N 1-A) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N 1-A) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0449) | |
2020-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 449 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB646ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Adoption (57-Y 39-N 1-A) |
2020-02-26 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108102D-S1 (57-Y 39-N 1-A) |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB646S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108102D-S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108102D-S1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (8-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N 1-A) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 40-N 1-A) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104051D |