VA HB646 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Tethering animals; adequate shelter and space. Provides that outdoor tethering of an animal shall not meet the requirement that an animal be given adequate shelter if it occurs (i) between 10 p.m. and 6 a.m., except when the animal is engaged in conduct related to an agricultural activity; (ii) when no owner is on the property; (iii) when the temperature is 32 degrees Fahrenheit or lower or 85 degrees Fahrenheit or higher; (iv) during a heat advisory; or (v) during a severe weather warning. The bill provides that a tether shall meet the requirement that an animal be given adequate space if it is four times the length of the animal or 15 feet in length, whichever is greater, and does not cause injury or pain, contain metal chain links, or weigh more than one-tenth of the animal's body weight.
Title
Tethering animals; adequate shelter and space.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104368D |