VA HB645 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; coverage for diabetes. Requires health insurers, health care subscription plans, and health maintenance organizations to include coverage for insulin, certain equipment, certain supplies, regular foot care and eye care exams, and up to three in-person outpatient self-management training and education visits upon an individual's initial diagnosis of diabetes and up to two such visits upon a significant change in an individual's condition. The bill provides greater specificity than the current law requiring coverage for equipment, supplies, and self-management training and education visits. The bill also provides that benefits or services required for the treatment of diabetes is exempt from any deductible. The provisions apply to any insurance policy, contract, or plan delivered, issued for delivery, reissued, or extended on and after January 1, 2021, or at any time thereafter when any term of the policy, contract, or plan is changed or any premium adjustment is made.
Title
Health insurance; coverage for diabetes.
Sponsors
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105134D |