VA HB643 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
First responders; reduced rate tuition. Requires each public institution of higher education to reduce by a rate of five percent the tuition charged to any enrolled student who is a first responder or the child of a first responder, regardless of the domicile of any such individual. The bill defines "first responder" as any emergency medical services agency employee, firefighter, law-enforcement officer, member of a search and rescue organization, member of a regional hazardous materials emergency response team, member of a community emergency response team, or member of a medical reserve corps who responds to and provides assistance during an emergency.
Title
First responders; reduced rate tuition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Education |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100194D |