VA HB642 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0372)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0372)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Military Affairs; health care insurance premiums for members of Virginia National Guard or Virginia Defense Force. Provides that the Department of Military Affairs shall have the power to pay the employer portion of health care premiums for any member of the Virginia National Guard or Virginia Defense Force when certain circumstances are met. The bill requires the Department to establish policies, procedures, and protocols to implement and record such payments and to report annually to the Secretary of Veterans and Defense Affairs all such payments made.
Title
Health care coverage; premium payments for certain service members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Block Vote (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Block Vote (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0372) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 372 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB642ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-11 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Mason, Bell, Kiggans |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Delegates: Carr, Freitas, McGuire |
2022-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-10 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | VOTE: Rejected (0-Y 98-N) |
2022-03-09 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 98-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage Block Vote (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House Block Vote (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-28 | House | Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102459D |
Same As/Similar To
SB719 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
SB719 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
SB719 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)