VA HB637 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Duties of drivers of vehicles approaching stationary vehicles displaying certain warning lights; penalty. Establishes a minimum fine of $500 for a violation of the requirement for drivers to make a lane change or proceed with caution when approaching stationary vehicles displaying certain warning lights, commonly known as the "Move Over" law. The bill requires a driver who cannot change lanes safely to pass the stationary vehicle at no more than 10 miles per hour.
Title
Drivers of vehicles approaching stationary vehicles displaying certain warning lights; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Transportation |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 Highway Safety and Policy |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101018D |