VA HB635 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Use of revenues by the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority. Requires that 70 percent of the revenues received by the Authority under §15.2-4838.1 be used by the Authority solely to fund transportation projects selected by the Authority that are contained in the regional transportation plan in accordance with §15.2-4830 and that have been rated in accordance with §33.1-13.03:1.
Title
Northern Virginia Transportation Authority; use of revenues.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Transportation |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102920D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB635 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB635+hil |