VA HB630 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Photo speed monitoring devices; locality-designated highway segments. Authorizes localities to, by ordinance, authorize their local law-enforcement agency to place and operate photo-speed monitoring devices in certain locations named in the ordinance, provided that (i) the highway has a posted speed limit of 35 miles per hour or greater; (ii) the ordinance identifies the locality-designated speeding offense to be enforced by the photo speed monitoring device; (iii) speeding, crash, or fatality data support the need for stronger enforcement against speeding; and (iv) in counties and towns whose roads are subject to the control and jurisdiction of the Department of Transportation, the locality-designated highway segment is in the secondary state highway system. The bill directs the locality to also identify the speeding violations that may be enforced by photo speed monitoring device. Current law authorizes the use of photo speed monitoring devices in highway work zones and school crossing zones.
Title
Photo speed monitoring devices; locality-designated highway segments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Public Safety |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned PS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101345D |