VA HB619 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Possession of controlled substances; residue. Provides that for the purposes of the crime of possession of controlled substances, "controlled substance" does not include mere residue of any substance that is not a usable quantity or a countable dosage unit. Possession of controlled substances; residue. Provides that for the purposes of the crime of possession of controlled substances, "controlled substance" does not include mere residue of any substance that is not a usable quantity or a countable dosage unit.
Title
Controlled substances; substance shall not include mere residue that is not a usable quantity, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2022-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104051D |