VA HB618 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0746)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Hate crimes; gender, disability, gender identity, or sexual orientation; penalty. Adds gender, disability, gender identity, and sexual orientation to the categories of victims whose intentional selection for a hate crime involving assault, assault and battery, or trespass for the purpose of damaging another's property results in a higher criminal penalty for the offense. The bill also adds gender, disability, gender identity, and sexual orientation to the categories of hate crimes that are to be reported to the central repository of information regarding hate crimes maintained by the Virginia State Police. The bill provides that a person who is subjected to acts of intimidation or harassment, violence directed against his person, or vandalism to his real or personal property, where such acts are motivated by gender, disability, gender identity, or sexual orientation, may bring a civil action to recover his damages. The bill also provides that no provider or user of an interactive computer service on the Internet shall be liable for any action voluntarily taken by it in good faith to restrict access to material that the provider or user considers to be intended to incite hatred on the basis of gender, disability, gender identity, or sexual orientation. The bill also eliminates the mandatory minimum terms of confinement for such hate crimes. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hate crimes; gender, disability, gender identity, or sexual orientation, penalty, effective clause.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 43-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 8-N) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0746)
2020-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 746 (effective - see bill)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB618ER)
2020-03-02HouseEnrolled
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Adoption (54-Y 43-N)
2020-02-26HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20108748D-S1 (54-Y 43-N)
2020-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-24SenatePassed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N)
2020-02-24SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB618S1
2020-02-24SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108748D-S1
2020-02-24SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-24SenateRead third time
2020-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108748D-S1
2020-02-19SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 5-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (56-Y 43-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB618H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106360D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseIncorporates HB488 (Kory)
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106360D-H1
2020-02-07HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 8-N)
2020-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N)
2020-02-04HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100865D

Same As/Similar To

HB488 (Similar To) 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182121(n/a)See Bill Text
18257(n/a)See Bill Text
80142.1(n/a)See Bill Text
80149.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB618&201+sum+HB618
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB618+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB618H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB618S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB618ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0746+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0801V0138+HB0618
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0233+HB0618
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0864+HB0618
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0391+HB0618
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0846HB0618+HB0618
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0906HB0618+HB0618
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1452+HB0618

Bill Comments

feedback