VA HB618 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Distributed electric generation; community solar gardens. Authorizes the establishment of community solar gardens, which are required to be owned by a subscriber organization that has at least 10 subscribers. Subscribers will receive credits on their utility bills from energy generated at the solar facility in proportion to the size of their subscription. The output and renewable energy credits from a solar garden shall be purchased by the utility in the form of net metering credits allocated to the subscribers. To the extent that a subscriber's net metering credit exceeds the subscriber's electric bill in any billing period, the credit will be applied against future bills. If the electricity output of the community solar garden is not fully subscribed, the utility is required to purchase the unsubscribed renewable energy at a rate equal to the utility's average hourly incremental cost of electricity supply over the immediately preceding calendar year.
Title
Distributed electric generation; establishment of community solar gardens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102786D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB618 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB618+hil |