VA HB617 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; repetitive motion injuries. Directs the Virginia Workers' Compensation Commission to engage an independent and reputable national research organization to examine the implications of covering workers' injuries caused by repetitive motion through the Virginia workers' compensation system.
Title
Workers' compensation; repetitive motion injuries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 549 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB617ER) |
2020-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB617H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107419D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107419D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100192D |