VA HB616 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle headlights; required to be lighted. Requires every vehicle in operation to display lighted headlights. Currently headlights are required to be lighted only (i) from sunset to sunrise; (ii) during any other time when, because of rain, smoke, fog, snow, sleet, insufficient light, or other unfavorable atmospheric conditions, visibility is reduced to a degree whereby persons or vehicles on the highway are not clearly discernible at a distance of 500 feet; and (iii) whenever windshield wipers are in use as a result of fog, rain, sleet, or snow. The bill removes provisions making the failure to display lighted headlights when windshield wipers are in use as a result of fog rain, sleet, or snow (a) a secondary offense, (b) subject to no demerit points being assessed, and (c) not a defense to any claim for personal injury or recovery of medical expenses for injuries sustained in a motor vehicle accident.
Title
Motor vehicles; when headlights to be lighted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Transportation |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101620D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1029.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |