VA HB614 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0451)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0451)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Practice of social work. Provides that the Board of Social Work may license baccalaureate social workers, master's social workers, and clinical social workers, as those terms are defined, and may register persons proposing to obtain supervised post-degree experience in the practice of social work.
Title
Social work; practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0451) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 451 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB614ER) |
2018-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101583D |