VA HB611 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (13-Y 2-N)
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (13-Y 2-N)
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need; exception. Authorizes the State Health Commissioner (Commissioner) to accept and review applications and issue a certificate of public need for new neonatal care services in Planning District 5, provided that certain conditions are met. The bill provides that the Commissioner shall not deny the application on the basis of economic or service volume impact on existing providers.
Title
Certificate of public need; issuance for new neonatal care services in Planning District 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 46-N) (Y: 49 N: 46 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 46-N) (Y: 49 N: 46 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (13-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 46-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (49-Y 46-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (12-Y 9-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102444D |