VA HB610 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB610
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (10-Y 3-N)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (10-Y 3-N)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Limitations period; previously time-barred actions; sexual abuse; two-year time period to file. Creates a two-year time period, on or after July 1, 2020, but before July 1, 2022, within which persons previously time-barred from filing an action for injury to such person for sexual abuse occurring during the infancy or incapacity of such person due to the expiration of the statute of limitations may file such an action.
Title
Limitations period; previously time-barred actions, sexual abuse, two-year time period to file.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (10-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102278D |
Same As/Similar To
HB610 (Carry Over) 2020-02-19 - Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (10-Y 3-N)