VA HB61 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-20 - Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Battlefield property; transfer of easements to United States. Directs the Secretary of Natural Resources (the Secretary) to endeavor to enter into a memorandum of understanding (MOU) with the United States to accomplish the transfer of the Commonwealth's easement interests in battlefield lands located within the boundaries of federal battlefield parks. The bill directs the Secretary to report on the status of the MOU to certain Senate and House committee chairmen by October 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Battlefields; entry into an agreement to transfer certain easements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateRead third time
2018-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-15SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2018-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (99-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2018-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB61H1
2018-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 18105890D-H1
2018-01-29HouseRead second time
2018-01-26HouseRead first time
2018-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 18105890D-H1
2018-01-24HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-15HouseAssigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #2
2017-12-04HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2017-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101736D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1012204(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB61
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB61+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB61H1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0102V0005+HB0061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H01V0010+HB0061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0118+HB0061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0128+HB0061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S01V0089+HB0061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0560HB0061+HB0061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0571HB0061+HB0061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0581HB0061+HB0061
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0582HB0061+HB0061

Bill Comments

feedback