VA HB604 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Warrant requirement for telecommunications records; location data. Provides that a provider of electronic communication service or remote computing service shall not disclose location data to an investigative or law-enforcement officer except pursuant to a search warrant. Currently, a warrant is required for the disclosure of real-time location data. The current exceptions for obtaining real-time location data without a warrant in certain emergency situations are retained.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecommunications; warrant requirement for records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2018-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103489D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19210.2(n/a)See Bill Text
19256(n/a)See Bill Text
19270.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback