VA HB601 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Agricultural enterprise facilities. Authorizes the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services (the Department) to establish agricultural enterprise facilities in rural areas of the Commonwealth, with each facility to include a commercial kitchen, a packaging and labeling facility, and an animal slaughtering facility. The bill directs the Department to locate the facilities near small-scale rural agricultural producers and to seek to establish a facility within 50 miles of every agricultural producer in the Commonwealth.
Title
Agricultural enterprise facilities; authorizes DACS to establish in rural areas of the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103270D |