VA HB600 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0516)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0516)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local government; criminal justice training academies. Eliminates the statutory requirement that criminal justice training academies contain the word "training" in their name or title.
Title
Criminal justice training academies; locality may eliminate requirement to contain word training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0516) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 516 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB600ER) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Printed as engrossed 10103620D-E | |
2010-02-02 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB600E | |
2010-02-02 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-02 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-01 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-29 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103620D |