VA HB60 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax; school construction. Adds Prince Edward County to the list of localities that, under current law, are authorized to impose an additional local sales and use tax at a rate not to exceed one percent, with the revenue used only for capital projects for the construction or renovation of schools.
Title
Sales and use tax, local; construction or renovation of schools in Prince Edward County.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Finance |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB805-Rasoul) by voice vote |
2024-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100828D |