VA HB60 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0310)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Goochland County; Economic Development Authority; board of directors; quorum. Authorizes the Board of Supervisors of Goochland County to appoint five members to the Board of Directors of the Goochland County Economic Development Authority. Three members of the board of directors shall constitute a quorum of the board for the purposes of conducting its business and exercising its powers and for all other purposes, except that no facilities owned by the authority shall be leased or disposed of in any manner without a majority vote of the members of the board of directors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Goochland County; members to Board of Directors of Goochland County Economic Development Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0310)
2018-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 310 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-05HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018
2018-03-02SenateSigned by President
2018-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-27HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB60ER)
2018-02-27HouseEnrolled
2018-02-23SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-23SenateRead third time
2018-02-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-20SenateReported from Local Government (11-Y 0-N)
2018-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2018-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-23HouseRead first time
2018-01-19HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-12-04HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2017-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101328D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1524904(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback