VA HB599 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Transfer of firearms; criminal history record information check; penalties. Adds a definition of "firearms show vendor" or "vendor" and requires that a criminal history record information check be performed on the prospective transferee before the vendor may transfer firearms at a gun show. Under current law, only licensed dealers must obtain such a check. The bill also requires that the promoter of a firearms show provide vendors access to licensed dealers who will conduct the criminal history record information check.
Title
Transfer of firearms; criminal history record information check, penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102711D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.2:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4201.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4201.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB599 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB599+hil |