VA HB597 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Mechanical devices designed to increase the rate of fire of firearms; penalty. Prohibits the manufacture, import, sale or offer to sell, possession, transfer, or transportation of any device used to increase the rate of fire of any semi-automatic firearm beyond the capability of an unaided person to operate the trigger mechanism of that firearm. A violation is punishable as a Class 3 misdemeanor.
Title
Firearms; mechanical devices designed to increase the rate of fire, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101662D |