VA HB592 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB592
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Official emblems and designations; state fruit. Designates the pawpaw fruit (Asimina triloba) as the state fruit of Virginia.
Title
Pawpaw fruit (Asimina triloba); designating as state fruit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in General Laws |
2020-02-06 | House | Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100537D |
Same As/Similar To
HB592 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB592 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB592+hil |