VA HB59 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Transportation; use of practical design methods. Requires the Department of Transportation to employ practical design methods for any highway system project, including all projects costing more than $5 million. "Practical design methods" are defined in the bill as practices that incorporate maximum flexibility in application of standards that reduce the cost of project delivery while preserving and enhancing safety and mobility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation, Department of; use of practical design methods.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in General Laws
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N)
2018-01-24HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2018-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-23HouseReferred from Transportation by voice vote
2018-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N)
2018-01-16HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-12-04HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101179D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
332261(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback