VA HB588 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-27 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Legal notices; online publications. Provides that, where any ordinance, resolution, notice, or advertisement is required by law to be published in a newspaper, such ordinance, resolution, notice, or advertisement may instead be published in an online publication. The bill further specifies the requirements for such online publication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legal notices; online publications.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-27HouseIncorporated by Courts of Justice
2020-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends incorporating (HB712-Hope) by voice vote
2020-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103342D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801324(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback