VA HB586 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Commissioner of Health; study of the occurrence of perfluorooctanoic acid (PFOA), perfluorooctane sulfonate (PFOS), perfluorobutyrate (PFBA), perfluoroheptanoic acid (PFHpA), perfluorohexane sulfonate (PFHxS), perfluorononanoic acid (PFNA), and other perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAS) in the Commonwealth's public drinking water; report. Directs the Commissioner of Health to convene a work group to study the occurrence of perfluorooctanoic acid (PFOA), perfluorooctane sulfonate (PFOS), perfluorobutyrate (PFBA), perfluoroheptanoic acid (PFHpA), perfluorohexane sulfonate (PFHxS), perfluorononanoic acid (PFNA), and other perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAS), as deemed necessary, in the Commonwealth's public drinking water and to develop recommendations for specific maximum contaminant levels for PFOA, PFOS, PFBA, PFHpA, PFHxS, PFNA, and other PFAS, as deemed necessary, for inclusion in regulations of the Board of Health applicable to waterworks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PFOA, PFOS, and PFAS; substances in public drinking water.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-20SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2020-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB586H1
2020-01-31HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106820D-H1
2020-01-31HouseRead second time
2020-01-30HouseRead first time
2020-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106820D-H1
2020-01-28HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104407D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback